Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Annotated Code of Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0002 (SB0002/CH0072)
Title
Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0049
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Lead Risk Reduction Compliance
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0151
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178 (SB0408)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Race and Speed Contests - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182 (SB0169)
Title
Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233 (SB0082)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670 /CH0059
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Police Discipline and Law Enforcement Programs and Procedures
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885 /CH0083 (SB0666/CH0082)
Title
Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals – Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0920
Title
Open Meetings Act - Definition - Administrative Function
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990 /CH0287 (SB0658/CH0288)
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management – Establishment and Transfer of Maryland 9–1–1 Board
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 /CH0072 (HB0002)
Title
Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0169 (HB0182)
Title
Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408 (HB0178)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Reckless Driving, Speed Contests, Registration Plates, and Noise Abatement - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Repeal and Procedures for Discipline
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658 /CH0288 (HB0990/CH0287)
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Establishment and Transfer of Maryland 9-1-1 Board
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 /CH0082 (HB0885/CH0083)
Title
Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 /CH0109
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0878 /CH0110
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0002 (SB0002/CH0072) Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021 Delegate Korman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0049 Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Lead Risk Reduction Compliance Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0151 Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Repeal Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0178 (SB0408) Vehicle Laws - Race and Speed Contests - Penalties Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0182 (SB0169) Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0233 (SB0082) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Maryland Music Therapists Act Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0670 /CH0059 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Police Discipline and Law Enforcement Programs and Procedures Speaker 6 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 59
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0885 /CH0083 (SB0666/CH0082) Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals – Renaming Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 83
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0920 Open Meetings Act - Definition - Administrative Function Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Recommitted to Health and Government Operations (Delegate Pendergrass)
Health and Government Operations
HB0990 /CH0287 (SB0658/CH0288) Maryland Department of Emergency Management – Establishment and Transfer of Maryland 9–1–1 Board Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0002 /CH0072 (HB0002) Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021 Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
Environment and Transportation
SB0068 Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Establishment Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
SB0169 (HB0182) Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0408 (HB0178) Vehicle Laws - Reckless Driving, Speed Contests, Registration Plates, and Noise Abatement - Penalties Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0627 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Repeal and Procedures for Discipline Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (94-42)
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0658 /CH0288 (HB0990/CH0287) Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Establishment and Transfer of Maryland 9-1-1 Board Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0666 /CH0082 (HB0885/CH0083) Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals - Renaming Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 82
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0877 /CH0109 Annual Corrective Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0878 /CH0110 Annual Curative Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/1/2021 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page