Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Ambulances -see also- Emergency Med Services; Rescue Squads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085 /CH0199 (SB0651/CH0200)
Title
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284
Title
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0513 (SB0695)
Title
Maryland Non–Emergency Medical Transportation Fund and Task Force to Study the Maryland Non–Emergency Medical Transportation Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0552 (SB0389)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Emergency Service Transporters - Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1313 (SB0067/CH0799)
Title
Emergency Medical Services - Paramedics - Vaccination Administration
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067 /CH0799 (HB1313)
Title
Emergency Medical Services – Paramedics – Vaccination Administration
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389 (HB0552)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Emergency Service Transporters - Reimbursement
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0651 /CH0200 (HB0085/CH0199)
Title
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 (HB0513)
Title
Maryland Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Fund and Task Force to Study the Maryland Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Fund
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0865
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Emergency Service Transporters - Reimbursement
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0001
Title
Congressional Action - Surprise Billing - Air Ambulance
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0085 /CH0199 (SB0651/CH0200) Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Economic Matters
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0284 Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0513 (SB0695) Maryland Non–Emergency Medical Transportation Fund and Task Force to Study the Maryland Non–Emergency Medical Transportation Fund Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB0552 (SB0389) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Emergency Service Transporters - Reimbursement Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB1313 (SB0067/CH0799) Emergency Medical Services - Paramedics - Vaccination Administration Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0067 /CH0799 (HB1313) Emergency Medical Services – Paramedics – Vaccination Administration Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 799
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0389 (HB0552) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Emergency Service Transporters - Reimbursement Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0651 /CH0200 (HB0085/CH0199) Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0695 (HB0513) Maryland Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Fund and Task Force to Study the Maryland Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Fund Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
SB0865 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Emergency Service Transporters - Reimbursement Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SJ0001 Congressional Action - Surprise Billing - Air Ambulance Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:49 AM
Click to return on the top page