Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0232 /CH0744
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License - Manufacturer's Licenses MC 23-22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233 /CH0745
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 7 Micro-Brewery License and Licenses in the Town of Kensington MC 07-22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0239
Title
Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class D Beer and Wine License – Farm Breweries and Limited Wineries MC 21–22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0281
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Permits for Wineries - Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0324 /CH0749 (SB0072/CH0750)
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry – Study
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0550 /CH0478 (SB0476/CH0477)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0854 /CH0461 (SB0698/CH0462)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0924 /CH0369 (SB0569/CH0370)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 4 Limited Winery Licenses - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0975 (SB0696/CH0314)
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment for Nurses and Nursing Support Staff - Program Establishment and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1123 (SB0351)
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License
Sponsor
Worcester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1282 (SB0567/CH0643)
Title
Property Tax - Agricultural Accessory Use Improvements - Study and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 /CH0750 (HB0324/CH0749)
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry – Study
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0102
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Beer to Retail Dealer
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0351 (HB1123)
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0476 /CH0477 (HB0550/CH0478)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0567 /CH0643 (HB1282)
Title
Property Tax - Agricultural Accessory Use Improvements - Study and Report
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0569 /CH0370 (HB0924/CH0369)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 4 Limited Winery Licenses - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698 /CH0462 (HB0854/CH0461)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0232 /CH0744 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License - Manufacturer's Licenses MC 23-22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 744
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0233 /CH0745 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 7 Micro-Brewery License and Licenses in the Town of Kensington MC 07-22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 745
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0239 Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class D Beer and Wine License – Farm Breweries and Limited Wineries MC 21–22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0281 Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Permits for Wineries - Sunset Repeal Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0324 /CH0749 (SB0072/CH0750) Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry – Study Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 749
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0550 /CH0478 (SB0476/CH0477) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits - Sunset Extension Delegate Watson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0854 /CH0461 (SB0698/CH0462) Alcoholic Beverages – Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0924 /CH0369 (SB0569/CH0370) Alcoholic Beverages - Class 4 Limited Winery Licenses - Extension Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0975 (SB0696/CH0314) Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment for Nurses and Nursing Support Staff - Program Establishment and Funding Delegate Charles 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1123 (SB0351) Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License Worcester County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1282 (SB0567/CH0643) Property Tax - Agricultural Accessory Use Improvements - Study and Report Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0072 /CH0750 (HB0324/CH0749) Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry – Study Senator Patterson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 750
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0102 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Beer to Retail Dealer Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0351 (HB1123) Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0476 /CH0477 (HB0550/CH0478) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits - Sunset Extension Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0567 /CH0643 (HB1282) Property Tax - Agricultural Accessory Use Improvements - Study and Report Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2022 - 2:45 PM
SB0569 /CH0370 (HB0924/CH0369) Alcoholic Beverages - Class 4 Limited Winery Licenses - Extension Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0698 /CH0462 (HB0854/CH0461) Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
SB1000 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License Harford County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 3:17 PM
Click to return on the top page