Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0422 (SB0285)
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0474 (SB0534)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Wineries and Vineyards - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0529 /CH0665
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Distillery On-Site Consumption Permit
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572 /CH0555 (SB0426/CH0556)
Title
Baltimore City - 46th District - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1018 /CH0543 (SB0833/CH0544)
Title
Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 /CH0360 (SB0821/CH0359)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 (HB0422)
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0426 /CH0556 (HB0572/CH0555)
Title
Baltimore City - 46th District - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0534 (HB0474)
Title
Income Tax Credit – Wineries and Vineyards – Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821 /CH0359 (HB1232/CH0360)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833 /CH0544 (HB1018/CH0543)
Title
Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0422 (SB0285) Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0474 (SB0534) Income Tax Credit - Wineries and Vineyards - Sunset Extension Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0529 /CH0665 St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Distillery On-Site Consumption Permit St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 665
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0572 /CH0555 (SB0426/CH0556) Baltimore City - 46th District - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 555
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1018 /CH0543 (SB0833/CH0544) Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 543
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1232 /CH0360 (SB0821/CH0359) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0285 (HB0422) Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0426 /CH0556 (HB0572/CH0555) Baltimore City - 46th District - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 556
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0534 (HB0474) Income Tax Credit – Wineries and Vineyards – Sunset Extension Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0821 /CH0359 (HB1232/CH0360) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0833 /CH0544 (HB1018/CH0543) Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License Charles County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 544
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page