Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Alcoholic Beverages -see also- AB-By Subdivision

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0232 (SB0218)
Title
Physicians and Allied Health Professions - Reorganization and Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312
Title
Physician Assistants - Collaboration Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0455 /CH0729 (SB0677/CH0730)
Title
Comptroller - Electronic Tax and Fee Return Filing Requirements
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0663
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Tax - Ready-to-Drink Cocktails
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0806 /CH0920 (SB0167/CH0919)
Title
Physician Assistants - Revisions (Physician Assistant Modernization Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065 /CH0746 (SB0774/CH0747)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Entertainment District Security Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1072
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Alcoholic Beverages - Rate Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217 (SB1041/CH0918)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries, Wineries, and Distilleries - Direct Delivery
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Food and Beverages
Sponsor
Delegate Fair
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1396
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Substance Use Disorder Treatment and Recovery Levels of Care - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1443
Title
Consumer and Display Fireworks – Regulation and Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1515
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0167 /CH0919 (HB0806/CH0920)
Title
Physician Assistants - Revisions (Physician Assistant Modernization Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0218 (HB0232)
Title
Physicians and Allied Health Professions - Reorganization and Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0537 (HB0805/CH0244)
Title
Cannabis - Licensee Locations - Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 /CH0730 (HB0455/CH0729)
Title
Comptroller - Electronic Tax and Fee Return Filing Requirements
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 /CH0747 (HB1065/CH0746)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Entertainment District Security Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0232 (SB0218) Physicians and Allied Health Professions - Reorganization and Revisions Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
1/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0312 Physician Assistants - Collaboration Agreements Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0455 /CH0729 (SB0677/CH0730) Comptroller - Electronic Tax and Fee Return Filing Requirements Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729
Ways and Means
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0663 Alcoholic Beverage Tax - Ready-to-Drink Cocktails Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0806 /CH0920 (SB0167/CH0919) Physician Assistants - Revisions (Physician Assistant Modernization Act of 2024) Delegate Kerr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 920
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1065 /CH0746 (SB0774/CH0747) Public Safety - Maryland Entertainment District Security Grant Program Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 746
Judiciary
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1072 Sales and Use Tax - Alcoholic Beverages - Rate Alteration Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1217 (SB1041/CH0918) Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries, Wineries, and Distilleries - Direct Delivery Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1306 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Food and Beverages Delegate Fair 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1396 Maryland Department of Health - Substance Use Disorder Treatment and Recovery Levels of Care - Study Delegate Howard 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1443 Consumer and Display Fireworks – Regulation and Tax Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1515 Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction and Services Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2024 - 11:00 AM
SB0167 /CH0919 (HB0806/CH0920) Physician Assistants - Revisions (Physician Assistant Modernization Act of 2024) Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 919
Finance
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0218 (HB0232) Physicians and Allied Health Professions - Reorganization and Revisions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0537 (HB0805/CH0244) Cannabis - Licensee Locations - Restrictions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Finance
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0677 /CH0730 (HB0455/CH0729) Comptroller - Electronic Tax and Fee Return Filing Requirements President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 730
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0774 /CH0747 (HB1065/CH0746) Public Safety - Maryland Entertainment District Security Grant Program Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 747
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:43 PM
Click to return on the top page