Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Alcoholic Beverages -see also- AB-By Subd; Subst Abuse; etc.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 /CH0140 (SB0205/CH0141)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0144 (SB0248)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer and Wine License
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0185 /CH0527
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - On-Sales - Required Multiple Purchases
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, T.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0422 (SB0285)
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0463 /CH0742 (SB0172/CH0741)
Title
Maryland Health Equity Resource Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0696
Title
Public Safety - Consumer and Display Fireworks
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796
Title
Sales and Use Tax – Alcoholic Beverages – Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0926
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties (Josette's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0994
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Retail Delivery - Class A License Holders
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1057
Title
Sales and Use Tax – Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 /CH0360 (SB0821/CH0359)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1287 /CH0796 (SB0646/CH0797)
Title
Alcohol and Drug Counseling - Alcohol and Drug Trainees - Practice Through Telehealth
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1336 /CH0397 (SB0761/CH0398)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Executive Directors - Membership and Vesting
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094
Title
Public Health – Local Health District Boards
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0741 (HB0463/CH0742)
Title
Maryland Health Equity Resource Act
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0205 /CH0141 (HB0012/CH0140)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0248 (HB0144)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer and Wine License
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 (HB0422)
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601
Title
Public Safety – Required Drug and Alcohol Testing for Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0646 /CH0797 (HB1287/CH0796)
Title
Alcohol and Drug Counseling - Alcohol and Drug Trainees - Practice Through Telehealth
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0761 /CH0398 (HB1336/CH0397)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Executive Directors - Membership and Vesting
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0775
Title
Family Law - Child Custody and Visitation - Abuse
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821 /CH0359 (HB1232/CH0360)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0012 /CH0140 (SB0205/CH0141) Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0144 (SB0248) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer and Wine License Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0185 /CH0527 Alcoholic Beverages - On-Sales - Required Multiple Purchases Delegate Branch, T. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 527
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0422 (SB0285) Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0463 /CH0742 (SB0172/CH0741) Maryland Health Equity Resource Act Delegate Barron 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 742
Health and Government Operations
2/02/2021 - 3:45 PM
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
Finance
HB0696 Public Safety - Consumer and Display Fireworks Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0796 Sales and Use Tax – Alcoholic Beverages – Rate Reduction Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0926 Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties (Josette's Law) Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0994 Alcoholic Beverages - Retail Delivery - Class A License Holders Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
HB1057 Sales and Use Tax – Rate Reduction Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1232 /CH0360 (SB0821/CH0359) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1287 /CH0796 (SB0646/CH0797) Alcohol and Drug Counseling - Alcohol and Drug Trainees - Practice Through Telehealth Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 796
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1336 /CH0397 (SB0761/CH0398) State Retirement and Pension System - Executive Directors - Membership and Vesting Delegate Proctor 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 397
Appropriations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0094 Public Health – Local Health District Boards Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0172 /CH0741 (HB0463/CH0742) Maryland Health Equity Resource Act Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 741
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Health and Government Operations
SB0205 /CH0141 (HB0012/CH0140) Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0248 (HB0144) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer and Wine License Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0285 (HB0422) Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0601 Public Safety – Required Drug and Alcohol Testing for Law Enforcement Officers Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0646 /CH0797 (HB1287/CH0796) Alcohol and Drug Counseling - Alcohol and Drug Trainees - Practice Through Telehealth Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 797
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0761 /CH0398 (HB1336/CH0397) State Retirement and Pension System - Executive Directors - Membership and Vesting Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 398
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2021 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0775 Family Law - Child Custody and Visitation - Abuse Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0821 /CH0359 (HB1232/CH0360) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:53 AM
Click to return on the top page