Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Aircraft

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0159
Title
Public Safety - Persistent Aerial Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254
Title
University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0696
Title
Public Safety - Consumer and Display Fireworks
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 (SB0835)
Title
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0599
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Surplus Military Equipment
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 (HB0803)
Title
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0001
Title
Congressional Action - Surprise Billing - Air Ambulance
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0159 Public Safety - Persistent Aerial Surveillance Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0254 University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0696 Public Safety - Consumer and Display Fireworks Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0803 (SB0835) Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0599 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Surplus Military Equipment Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0835 (HB0803) Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SJ0001 Congressional Action - Surprise Billing - Air Ambulance Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page