Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

AIDS

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0245 (SB0331/CH0144)
Title
Program for Preventing HIV Infection for Rape Victims - Alterations and Repeal of Sunset
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0953
Title
Parent and Guardian Rights - Education, Health, and Upbringing of Children
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970 /CH0684 (SB0787)
Title
Managed Care Organizations and Health Insurance Carriers - Prior Authorization for HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1219 /CH0371
Title
Pharmacists - Status as Health Care Providers and Study on Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0186 /CH0222
Title
Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program Fund
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 /CH0144 (HB0245)
Title
Program for Preventing HIV Infection for Rape Victims – Alterations and Repeal of Sunset
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355
Title
HIV Prevention Drugs - Prescribing and Dispensing by Pharmacists and Insurance Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0547
Title
Public Health - Prohibition on Transfer of Human Immunodeficiency Virus - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB0970/CH0684)
Title
Managed Care Organizations and Health Insurance Carriers - Prior Authorization for HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis for Victims of Sexual Offenses - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0245 (SB0331/CH0144) Program for Preventing HIV Infection for Rape Victims - Alterations and Repeal of Sunset Delegate Reznik 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2022 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
HB0953 Parent and Guardian Rights - Education, Health, and Upbringing of Children Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2022 - 12:30 PM
HB0970 /CH0684 (SB0787) Managed Care Organizations and Health Insurance Carriers - Prior Authorization for HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis - Prohibition Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1219 /CH0371 Pharmacists - Status as Health Care Providers and Study on Reimbursement Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
SB0186 /CH0222 Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program Fund Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0331 /CH0144 (HB0245) Program for Preventing HIV Infection for Rape Victims – Alterations and Repeal of Sunset Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
SB0355 HIV Prevention Drugs - Prescribing and Dispensing by Pharmacists and Insurance Requirements Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0547 Public Health - Prohibition on Transfer of Human Immunodeficiency Virus - Repeal Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0787 (HB0970/CH0684) Managed Care Organizations and Health Insurance Carriers - Prior Authorization for HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis for Victims of Sexual Offenses - Prohibition Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:23 PM
Click to return on the top page