Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Admissions and Amusement Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0455 /CH0729 (SB0677/CH0730)
Title
Comptroller - Electronic Tax and Fee Return Filing Requirements
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1281 /CH0239 (SB0014/CH0240)
Title
Economic Development - Tourism Zones - Designation and Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Food and Beverages
Sponsor
Delegate Fair
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0014 /CH0240 (HB1281/CH0239)
Title
Economic Development - Tourism Zones - Designation and Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 /CH0730 (HB0455/CH0729)
Title
Comptroller - Electronic Tax and Fee Return Filing Requirements
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0455 /CH0729 (SB0677/CH0730) Comptroller - Electronic Tax and Fee Return Filing Requirements Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729
Ways and Means
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1281 /CH0239 (SB0014/CH0240) Economic Development - Tourism Zones - Designation and Benefits Delegate Hartman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Ways and Means
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1306 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Food and Beverages Delegate Fair 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0014 /CH0240 (HB1281/CH0239) Economic Development - Tourism Zones - Designation and Benefits Senator Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2024 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2024 - 12:00 PM
SB0677 /CH0730 (HB0455/CH0729) Comptroller - Electronic Tax and Fee Return Filing Requirements President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 730
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:37 PM
Click to return on the top page