Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Administrative Office of the Courts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0128 /CH0385 (SB0220/CH0386)
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326
Title
Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information on Judge or Magistrate
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0413
Title
Judges - Implicit Bias - Testing, Training, and Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0585
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Financial Capabilities and Legal Assistance Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0672
Title
Department of Juvenile Services – Juvenile Offense Database
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0950
Title
Judges - Community and Cultural Awareness Training
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1036 (SB0675)
Title
Child Custody – Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence – Training for Judges and Child’s Counsel
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0069 (HB0879)
Title
Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations - Establishment and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 /CH0386 (HB0128/CH0385)
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355
Title
Family Law – Custody Evaluators – Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612)
Title
Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 (HB1036)
Title
Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges and Child's Counsel
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0128 /CH0385 (SB0220/CH0386) Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties Delegate Stewart 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 385
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0326 Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information on Judge or Magistrate Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/27/2021 - 2:30 PM
HB0413 Judges - Implicit Bias - Testing, Training, and Evaluation Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/27/2021 - 2:30 PM
HB0585 Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Financial Capabilities and Legal Assistance Fund Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0672 Department of Juvenile Services – Juvenile Offense Database Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0950 Judges - Community and Cultural Awareness Training Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1036 (SB0675) Child Custody – Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence – Training for Judges and Child’s Counsel Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0069 (HB0879) Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations - Establishment and Reporting Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0220 /CH0386 (HB0128/CH0385) Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties Senator Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 386
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0355 Family Law – Custody Evaluators – Qualifications and Training Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612) Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0675 (HB1036) Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges and Child's Counsel Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 10:22 AM
Click to return on the top page