Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Acupuncturists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149 /CH0779
Title
Medical Records - Destruction - Notice and Retrieval
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0236 /CH0387
Title
State Acupuncture Board – Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0149 /CH0779 Medical Records - Destruction - Notice and Retrieval Delegate Pippy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 779
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Finance
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0184 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0236 /CH0387 State Acupuncture Board – Sunset Extension Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Finance
1/16/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/23/2024 2:38 PM
Click to return on the top page