Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Accountants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0273
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0286
Title
Task Force on Common Ownership Communities
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0599 /CH0123 (SB0483)
Title
Maryland Community Investment Corporation - Establishment (Housing and Community Development Financing Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 /CH1028 (SB0904/CH1029)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0483 (HB0599/CH0123)
Title
Maryland Community Investment Corporation - Establishment (Housing and Community Development Financing Act of 2024)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0273 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2024 - 1:30 PM
HB0286 Task Force on Common Ownership Communities Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0599 /CH0123 (SB0483) Maryland Community Investment Corporation - Establishment (Housing and Community Development Financing Act of 2024) Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Budget and Taxation
HB1089 /CH1028 (SB0904/CH1029) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Delegate Clippinger 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1028
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0483 (HB0599/CH0123) Maryland Community Investment Corporation - Establishment (Housing and Community Development Financing Act of 2024) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:51 PM
Click to return on the top page