Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Accountants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540 /CH0172 (SB0437/CH0173)
Title
Agriculture - University of Maryland Extension - Urban Farmer Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1479 (SB0885/CH0391)
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Maryland Equity Investment Fund - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0885 /CH0391 (HB1479)
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Maryland Equity Investment Fund - Established
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0540 /CH0172 (SB0437/CH0173) Agriculture - University of Maryland Extension - Urban Farmer Assistance Delegate Henson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Appropriations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1479 (SB0885/CH0391) Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Maryland Equity Investment Fund - Established Delegate Lierman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0885 /CH0391 (HB1479) Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Maryland Equity Investment Fund - Established Senator Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 10:19 AM
Click to return on the top page