Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Accidents

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 (SB0129)
Title
Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0118 /CH0165 (SB0293/CH0166)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204 /CH0442 (SB0324/CH0443)
Title
Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0668 (SB0495)
Title
Reckless and Negligent Driving – Death of Another – Must–Appear Violation (Sherry’s and Ryan’s Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097
Title
Purple Line Marketing Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0129 (HB0054)
Title
Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0293 /CH0166 (HB0118/CH0165)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324 /CH0443 (HB0204/CH0442)
Title
Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0495 (HB0668)
Title
Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0054 (SB0129) Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0118 /CH0165 (SB0293/CH0166) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Environment and Transportation
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0204 /CH0442 (SB0324/CH0443) Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 442
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0668 (SB0495) Reckless and Negligent Driving – Death of Another – Must–Appear Violation (Sherry’s and Ryan’s Law) Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0097 Purple Line Marketing Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0129 (HB0054) Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2021 - 3:00 PM
SB0293 /CH0166 (HB0118/CH0165) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0324 /CH0443 (HB0204/CH0442) Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0495 (HB0668) Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 11:59 AM
Click to return on the top page