Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Abuse -see also- Child Abuse & Neg.; Elder Abuse & Neg., etc

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0016 /CH0181 (SB0044/CH0182)
Title
Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161
Title
Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0165
Title
Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Human and Sex Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1062 /CH0180 (SB0877)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1131
Title
Courts - Falsely Summoning a Police Officer - Civil Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1178
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Coercive Control
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255 /CH0031 (SB0705/CH0562)
Title
Education - Physical Restraint and Seclusion - Limitations, Reporting, and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1323 /CH0442
Title
Victims of Sexual Abuse – Provision of Services – Technical Correction
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1329
Title
Suicide Treatment Improvement Act
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1420 (SB0672)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse or Neglect - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1442 (SB0710)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Expungement of Records – Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0031
Title
Public Information Act – Inspection of Records From Body–Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0044 /CH0182 (HB0016/CH0181)
Title
Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 (HB1420)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse or Neglect - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0705 /CH0562 (HB1255/CH0031)
Title
Education – Physical Restraint and Seclusion – Limitations, Reporting, and Training
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0710 (HB1442)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1062/CH0180)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0016 /CH0181 (SB0044/CH0182) Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat Delegate Lehman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Environment and Transportation
1/13/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0161 Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0165 Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Human and Sex Trafficking Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1062 /CH0180 (SB0877) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal Delegate Moon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1131 Courts - Falsely Summoning a Police Officer - Civil Liability Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1178 Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Coercive Control Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1255 /CH0031 (SB0705/CH0562) Education - Physical Restraint and Seclusion - Limitations, Reporting, and Training Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 31
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1323 /CH0442 Victims of Sexual Abuse – Provision of Services – Technical Correction Delegate Bartlett 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Judiciary
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1329 Suicide Treatment Improvement Act Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1420 (SB0672) Criminal Law - Animal Abuse or Neglect - Penalties Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1442 (SB0710) Criminal Procedure – Expungement of Records – Modifications Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0031 Public Information Act – Inspection of Records From Body–Worn Digital Recording Devices Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0044 /CH0182 (HB0016/CH0181) Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0672 (HB1420) Criminal Law - Animal Abuse or Neglect - Penalties Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0705 /CH0562 (HB1255/CH0031) Education – Physical Restraint and Seclusion – Limitations, Reporting, and Training Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2022 - 1:03 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0710 (HB1442) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Modifications Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 (HB1062/CH0180) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:07 PM
Click to return on the top page