Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Abduction

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0193 /CH0085 (SB0484/CH0086)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0533
Title
State Government – Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1029
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 /CH0086 (HB0193/CH0085)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0587
Title
Task Force on Facial Recognition Privacy Protection
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0193 /CH0085 (SB0484/CH0086) Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Judiciary
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0533 State Government – Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1029 Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
SB0484 /CH0086 (HB0193/CH0085) Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0587 Task Force on Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:18 PM
Click to return on the top page