Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Abandoned Property

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0328
Title
Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0514 /CH0806 (SB0413/CH0807)
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981 /CH0390
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction PG 413-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328
Title
Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Public Notices and Hearings
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0413 /CH0807 (HB0514/CH0806)
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding – Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0328 Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0514 /CH0806 (SB0413/CH0807) Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 806
Appropriations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0981 /CH0390 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction PG 413-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 390
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0346 Department of Natural Resources - Public Notices and Hearings Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0413 /CH0807 (HB0514/CH0806) Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding – Abandoned Property Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:51 AM
Click to return on the top page