Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 /CH0140 (SB0205/CH0141)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0185 /CH0527
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - On-Sales - Required Multiple Purchases
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, T.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0422 (SB0285)
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0994
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Retail Delivery - Class A License Holders
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0996 (SB0763)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Licenses – Retail Grocery Establishments (Healthy Food Accountability Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 /CH0360 (SB0821/CH0359)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1336 /CH0397 (SB0761/CH0398)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Executive Directors - Membership and Vesting
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0205 /CH0141 (HB0012/CH0140)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 (HB0422)
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0761 /CH0398 (HB1336/CH0397)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Executive Directors - Membership and Vesting
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 (HB0996)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Licenses – Retail Grocery Establishments (Healthy Food Accountability Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821 /CH0359 (HB1232/CH0360)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0012 /CH0140 (SB0205/CH0141) Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0185 /CH0527 Alcoholic Beverages - On-Sales - Required Multiple Purchases Delegate Branch, T. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 527
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0422 (SB0285) Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0994 Alcoholic Beverages - Retail Delivery - Class A License Holders Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
HB0996 (SB0763) Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Licenses – Retail Grocery Establishments (Healthy Food Accountability Act of 2021) Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
HB1232 /CH0360 (SB0821/CH0359) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1336 /CH0397 (SB0761/CH0398) State Retirement and Pension System - Executive Directors - Membership and Vesting Delegate Proctor 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 397
Appropriations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0205 /CH0141 (HB0012/CH0140) Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0285 (HB0422) Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0761 /CH0398 (HB1336/CH0397) State Retirement and Pension System - Executive Directors - Membership and Vesting Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 398
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2021 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0763 (HB0996) Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Licenses – Retail Grocery Establishments (Healthy Food Accountability Act of 2021) Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0821 /CH0359 (HB1232/CH0360) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:14 PM
Click to return on the top page