Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Washington County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0280 /CH0748
Title
Washington County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class CT License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0281
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Permits for Wineries - Sunset Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0311
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Class 3 Winery
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0856 /CH0760
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - University and College Hospitality Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0873
Title
Washington County - Sheriff's Salary - Alteration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1042
Title
Public Information Act – Police Officers – Unfounded Complaints
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1106 /CH0763
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Wine
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117 /CH0765
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B and D Licenses - Sidewalk Cafe/Patio Permit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1477 /CH0250
Title
Washington County - Mobile Home Parks and Mobile Home Tax - Revisions and Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0280 /CH0748 Washington County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class CT License By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 748
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0281 Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Permits for Wineries - Sunset Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0311 Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Class 3 Winery By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0856 /CH0760 Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - University and College Hospitality Beer, Wine, and Liquor License By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0873 Washington County - Sheriff's Salary - Alteration By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1042 Public Information Act – Police Officers – Unfounded Complaints By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1106 /CH0763 Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Wine By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 763
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1117 /CH0765 Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B and D Licenses - Sidewalk Cafe/Patio Permit By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 765
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1477 /CH0250 Washington County - Mobile Home Parks and Mobile Home Tax - Revisions and Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Ways and Means
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:29 PM
Click to return on the top page