Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Prince George's County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0354
Title
Prince George's County - Nonschool Use of Public School Facilities PG 505-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0217
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses for Supermarkets PG 304-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0357 /CH0751
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 301-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0359
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Transfer of Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor License PG 302-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0394 /CH0610
Title
Prince George's County - Municipal Tax Setoff, School Facilities Surcharge, and Public Safety and Behavioral Health Surcharge - Reports PG 402-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0398
Title
Prince George's County - Land Use - Inclusionary Zoning Around Transit Stations PG 404-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401
Title
Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0874 (SB0233)
Title
Prince George's County - Natural Resources - Archery Hunting Safety Zones PG 405-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1050 /CH0762
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Limits and Renewal Application Deadline for Class B Licenses PG 305-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1057 /CH0218
Title
Prince George's County - Recreation Blue Ribbon Workgroup PG 406-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1090
Title
Prince George’s County Board of Education – Membership – Alterations PG 506–22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1341
Title
Prince George’s County – Other Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices – Requirements and Limitations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1473 /CH0454
Title
Prince George's County - School Board Districts - Redistricting Plan PG 507-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0354 Prince George's County - Nonschool Use of Public School Facilities PG 505-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0355 /CH0217 Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0356 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses for Supermarkets PG 304-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0357 /CH0751 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 301-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 751
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0359 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Transfer of Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor License PG 302-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Senate Refuses to Recede
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0394 /CH0610 Prince George's County - Municipal Tax Setoff, School Facilities Surcharge, and Public Safety and Behavioral Health Surcharge - Reports PG 402-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 610
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0398 Prince George's County - Land Use - Inclusionary Zoning Around Transit Stations PG 404-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0401 Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0874 (SB0233) Prince George's County - Natural Resources - Archery Hunting Safety Zones PG 405-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1050 /CH0762 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Limits and Renewal Application Deadline for Class B Licenses PG 305-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 762
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/07/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1057 /CH0218 Prince George's County - Recreation Blue Ribbon Workgroup PG 406-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1090 Prince George’s County Board of Education – Membership – Alterations PG 506–22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB1341 Prince George’s County – Other Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices – Requirements and Limitations By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1473 /CH0454 Prince George's County - School Board Districts - Redistricting Plan PG 507-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2022 - 8:30 AM
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:30 PM
Click to return on the top page