Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Montgomery County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0428 /CH0231
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Annual Fees MC 19-21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0430 /CH0532
Title
Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Seating Requirements MC 11–21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431
Title
Montgomery County - Interference With Electric Company's Vegetation Management Compliance - Exemption MC 10-21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432 /CH0531
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Draft Beer for Off-Site Consumption in Damascus MC 12-21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0433
Title
Montgomery County – Public Campaign Financing – Expansion MC 14–21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0440
Title
Burtonsville Crossing - Acquisition by Montgomery County MC 13-21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490
Title
Montgomery County – Deer Management Permit Pilot Program MC 15–21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0541 /CH0593
Title
Montgomery County – Residential Property Sales – School District Information MC 01-21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0550
Title
Montgomery County - Education - School Site Council Pilot Program MC 21-21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0562 /CH0689
Title
Montgomery County – Speed Limits – Establishment MC 02–21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564
Title
Montgomery County – Automated Traffic Enforcement – Implementing Agency MC 04–21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0567 /CH0433
Title
Montgomery County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies MC 3-21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0571 /CH0367
Title
Montgomery County - Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Property Tax Abatement MC 20-21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574
Title
Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 8–21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0767
Title
Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 22-21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 /CH0449
Title
Montgomery County - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program MC 17-21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0769 /CH0431
Title
Montgomery County – Housing Opportunities Commission – Public Body MC 07–21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0428 /CH0231 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Annual Fees MC 19-21 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0430 /CH0532 Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Seating Requirements MC 11–21 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 532
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0431 Montgomery County - Interference With Electric Company's Vegetation Management Compliance - Exemption MC 10-21 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0432 /CH0531 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Draft Beer for Off-Site Consumption in Damascus MC 12-21 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0433 Montgomery County – Public Campaign Financing – Expansion MC 14–21 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0440 Burtonsville Crossing - Acquisition by Montgomery County MC 13-21 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0490 Montgomery County – Deer Management Permit Pilot Program MC 15–21 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0541 /CH0593 Montgomery County – Residential Property Sales – School District Information MC 01-21 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 593
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0550 Montgomery County - Education - School Site Council Pilot Program MC 21-21 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
2/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
HB0562 /CH0689 Montgomery County – Speed Limits – Establishment MC 02–21 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 689
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0564 Montgomery County – Automated Traffic Enforcement – Implementing Agency MC 04–21 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0567 /CH0433 Montgomery County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies MC 3-21 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 433
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0571 /CH0367 Montgomery County - Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Property Tax Abatement MC 20-21 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 367
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0574 Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 8–21 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0767 Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 22-21 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0768 /CH0449 Montgomery County - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program MC 17-21 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 449
Economic Matters
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0769 /CH0431 Montgomery County – Housing Opportunities Commission – Public Body MC 07–21 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 431
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:16 AM
Click to return on the top page