Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judicial Proceedings Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0219
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Facilities - J. DeWeese Carter Center
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0176 /CH0232
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rear-Facing Child Safety Seats - Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0189
Title
Controlled Substances - Schedules
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0198 /CH0137
Title
Correctional Officer - Death Benefit - Eligibility
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0203 /CH0228
Title
Children in Need of Assistance – Custody and Guardianship and Review Hearings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208
Title
Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Service Provider - Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0212
Title
Correctional Officer - Employment - Age Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0214
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Reports and Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0216 /CH0226
Title
Evidence - Approval of Breath and Blood Tests for Alcohol, Drugs, or Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0218 /CH0119
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses and Identification Cards – Temporary Renewal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0172 /CH0219 Department of Juvenile Services - Facilities - J. DeWeese Carter Center By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0176 /CH0232 Vehicle Laws - Rear-Facing Child Safety Seats - Requirement By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0189 Controlled Substances - Schedules By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0198 /CH0137 Correctional Officer - Death Benefit - Eligibility By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0203 /CH0228 Children in Need of Assistance – Custody and Guardianship and Review Hearings By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0208 Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Service Provider - Penalties By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0212 Correctional Officer - Employment - Age Requirement By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0214 Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Reports and Records By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0216 /CH0226 Evidence - Approval of Breath and Blood Tests for Alcohol, Drugs, or Controlled Dangerous Substances By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0218 /CH0119 Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses and Identification Cards – Temporary Renewal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:34 AM
Click to return on the top page