Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Judicial Proceedings Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0032
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Limitation of Liability
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0044
Title
Correctional Officers - Age Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 /CH0124
Title
Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Merger of Programs and Expanded Participant Eligibility
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0118 /CH0127
Title
Correctional Services - Warrant Apprehension Unit - Transfer
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0132 /CH0125
Title
Inspection of Public Records – Notaries Public – Disclosure of Home Address and Phone Number
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0181 /CH0106
Title
Corporations and Associations - Trade Name Certificates - Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0212 /CH0126
Title
State Government - Notaries Public - Official Stamp of a Notary Public
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0222
Title
Juveniles Charged as Adults – Study and Confinement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264
Title
Criminal Procedure – Lifetime Sexual Offender Supervision – Conditions, Violations, and Petitions for Discharge
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0267 /CH0129
Title
Family Law – Investigation of Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect – Preliminary Report to State’s Attorney
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0291 /CH0118
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses – Following Too Closely – Unified Truck Travel
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0320 /CH0107
Title
Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0032 Maryland Transit Administration - Limitation of Liability By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
SB0044 Correctional Officers - Age Requirement By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
SB0109 /CH0124 Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Merger of Programs and Expanded Participant Eligibility By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Judiciary
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0118 /CH0127 Correctional Services - Warrant Apprehension Unit - Transfer By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Judiciary
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0132 /CH0125 Inspection of Public Records – Notaries Public – Disclosure of Home Address and Phone Number By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0181 /CH0106 Corporations and Associations - Trade Name Certificates - Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0212 /CH0126 State Government - Notaries Public - Official Stamp of a Notary Public By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0222 Juveniles Charged as Adults – Study and Confinement By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Judiciary
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0264 Criminal Procedure – Lifetime Sexual Offender Supervision – Conditions, Violations, and Petitions for Discharge By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
SB0267 /CH0129 Family Law – Investigation of Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect – Preliminary Report to State’s Attorney By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Judiciary
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0291 /CH0118 Motor Vehicle Offenses – Following Too Closely – Unified Truck Travel By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0320 /CH0107 Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/20/2021 3:47 PM
Click to return on the top page