Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Howard County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840 /CH0759
Title
Howard County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022 Ho. Co. 13-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0865
Title
Howard County – Due Process Proceedings for Children With Disabilities – Burden of Proof Ho. Co. 02-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0868 /CH0539
Title
Circuit Court for Howard County – Judges Sitting as Orphans’ Court Ho. Co. 06–22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0878 /CH0704
Title
Howard County - Department of Housing and Community Development - Housing Opportunities Trust Fund Ho. Co. 05-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885 /CH0538
Title
Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Ho. Co. 03-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1212
Title
Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Residency Requirements Ho. Co. 16–22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247 /CH0103
Title
Howard County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors to Offset Property Tax Rate Increase Ho. Co. 10-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306
Title
Howard County - Public Schools - Alternative Instruction Model Policy Ho. Co. 09-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Petition of Support Requirement Ho. Co. 15-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1308 /CH0773
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Notifications Ho. Co. 14-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1461
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consideration of Factors for Issuance of Licenses Ho. Co. 11-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0840 /CH0759 Howard County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022 Ho. Co. 13-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 759
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0865 Howard County – Due Process Proceedings for Children With Disabilities – Burden of Proof Ho. Co. 02-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0868 /CH0539 Circuit Court for Howard County – Judges Sitting as Orphans’ Court Ho. Co. 06–22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 539
Judiciary
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0878 /CH0704 Howard County - Department of Housing and Community Development - Housing Opportunities Trust Fund Ho. Co. 05-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0885 /CH0538 Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Ho. Co. 03-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 538
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1212 Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Residency Requirements Ho. Co. 16–22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1247 /CH0103 Howard County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors to Offset Property Tax Rate Increase Ho. Co. 10-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1306 Howard County - Public Schools - Alternative Instruction Model Policy Ho. Co. 09-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1307 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Petition of Support Requirement Ho. Co. 15-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1308 /CH0773 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Notifications Ho. Co. 14-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 773
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1461 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consideration of Factors for Issuance of Licenses Ho. Co. 11-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:28 PM
Click to return on the top page