Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Frederick County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0759 (SB0647)
Title
Frederick County - Electronic Tip Jar Machines - Authorization and Regulation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 (SB0650)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Population
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0771 (SB0702)
Title
Baltimore County and Frederick County – Career Exploration and Development Activities – Sale of Coffee
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1157
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Renewal Application Filing Period
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Population
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1175
Title
Frederick County - Board of Education - Vacancies
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1234 (SB0648)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0759 (SB0647) Frederick County - Electronic Tip Jar Machines - Authorization and Regulation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0768 (SB0650) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Population By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0771 (SB0702) Baltimore County and Frederick County – Career Exploration and Development Activities – Sale of Coffee By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1157 Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Renewal Application Filing Period By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1159 Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Population By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1175 Frederick County - Board of Education - Vacancies By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1234 (SB0648) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/17/2022 8:39 PM
Click to return on the top page