Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Charles County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0750 (HB1072)
Title
Charles County - Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs - Authorization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0751 (HB1081)
Title
Southern Maryland - Human Relations Commission
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0832 (HB1061)
Title
Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833 (HB1018)
Title
Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 (HB1024)
Title
Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0750 (HB1072) Charles County - Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs - Authorization By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
Judiciary
SB0751 (HB1081) Southern Maryland - Human Relations Commission By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2021 - 1:15 PM
SB0832 (HB1061) Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0833 (HB1018) Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0939 (HB1024) Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 9:30 PM
Click to return on the top page