Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Charles County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1018 (SB0833)
Title
Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 (SB0939)
Title
Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1061 (SB0832)
Title
Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1072 (SB0750)
Title
Charles County – Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs – Authorization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1081 (SB0751)
Title
Southern Maryland – Human Relations Commission
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1018 (SB0833) Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1024 (SB0939) Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1061 (SB0832) Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1072 (SB0750) Charles County – Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs – Authorization By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1081 (SB0751) Southern Maryland – Human Relations Commission By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page