Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Charles County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0514 /CH0424 (SB0388)
Title
Charles County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0739 /CH0425 (SB0916/CH0426)
Title
Workgroup to Study the Fiscal and Operational Viability of Public-Private Partnerships for Charles County Public Schools
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1116
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Abeyance of License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415
Title
Grading and Sediment Control Plans - Agricultural Land Management Practices - Definition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1416
Title
Charles County - Property Tax - Credit for Volunteer Emergency Responders
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1423 (SB0965)
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428
Title
Code Counties - Legislative Procedure - Notice Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0514 /CH0424 (SB0388) Charles County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0739 /CH0425 (SB0916/CH0426) Workgroup to Study the Fiscal and Operational Viability of Public-Private Partnerships for Charles County Public Schools By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1116 Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Abeyance of License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1415 Grading and Sediment Control Plans - Agricultural Land Management Practices - Definition By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1416 Charles County - Property Tax - Credit for Volunteer Emergency Responders By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1423 (SB0965) Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Economic Matters
HB1428 Code Counties - Legislative Procedure - Notice Requirements By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/25/2022 8:42 AM
Click to return on the top page