Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Cecil County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 (SB0604)
Title
Cecil County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0582 (SB0294)
Title
Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0692 (SB0823)
Title
Cecil County - Board of Education - Member Terms and Compensation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0693 (SB0799)
Title
Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0859 (SB0797)
Title
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259 (SB0919)
Title
Horse Racing – Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1329 (SB0541)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway - Toll Plazas
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0575 (SB0604) Cecil County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0582 (SB0294) Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0692 (SB0823) Cecil County - Board of Education - Member Terms and Compensation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0693 (SB0799) Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0859 (SB0797) Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1259 (SB0919) Horse Racing – Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1329 (SB0541) Maryland Transportation Authority - John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway - Toll Plazas By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 11:21 PM
Click to return on the top page