Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Carroll County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371 /CH0276 (HB0728)
Title
Carroll County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0580 (HB0689)
Title
Carroll County - Board of Education - Member Compensation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0545 /CH0606 (HB1182/CH0605)
Title
Carroll County - Commissioners - Compensation and Benefits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 /CH0102
Title
Carroll County - County Commissioner Districts - Redistricting Plan
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0906 /CH0278 (HB0692/CH0277)
Title
Carroll County - State's Attorney - Restrictions on Practice
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0371 /CH0276 (HB0728) Carroll County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0436 /CH0580 (HB0689) Carroll County - Board of Education - Member Compensation By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0545 /CH0606 (HB1182/CH0605) Carroll County - Commissioners - Compensation and Benefits By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 606
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0641 /CH0102 Carroll County - County Commissioner Districts - Redistricting Plan By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Reapportionment and Redistricting
2/17/2022 - 11:30 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0906 /CH0278 (HB0692/CH0277) Carroll County - State's Attorney - Restrictions on Practice By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:18 PM
Click to return on the top page