Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Calvert County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1160 /CH0623
Title
Calvert County – Long–Term Contracts for Cellular Tower Leases
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1173 /CH0729
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1174
Title
State Boat Act – Removal of Vessels From Marinas – Calvert County Board of County Commissioners Facilities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1160 /CH0623 Calvert County – Long–Term Contracts for Cellular Tower Leases By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 623
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1173 /CH0729 Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 729
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1174 State Boat Act – Removal of Vessels From Marinas – Calvert County Board of County Commissioners Facilities By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:21 AM
Click to return on the top page