Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Baltimore County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0192
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Members - Training and Student Member Voting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0302 /CH0100 (SB0349/CH0101)
Title
Baltimore County – Property Tax – Credit for Homeowners Who Have Suffered a Hardship
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0476
Title
Baltimore County – Board of Education – Member Appointments and Terms and Election of Officers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0680 /CH0338
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Supermarkets
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0192 Baltimore County Board of Education - Members - Training and Student Member Voting By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0302 /CH0100 (SB0349/CH0101) Baltimore County – Property Tax – Credit for Homeowners Who Have Suffered a Hardship By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Ways and Means
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0476 Baltimore County – Board of Education – Member Appointments and Terms and Election of Officers By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - House Requests Senate Recede
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0680 /CH0338 Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Supermarkets By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Ways and Means
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:14 PM
Click to return on the top page