Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

St. Mary's County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0526 (SB0239)
Title
St. Mary’s County – Public and Nonpublic Schools – Prohibition on Possession of Tobacco Products by Minors
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0527
Title
St. Mary’s County Human Relations Commission – Equal Treatment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 /CH0589
Title
St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0529 /CH0665
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Distillery On-Site Consumption Permit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0530 /CH0283
Title
St. Mary's County - Gaming - Administration of Bingo Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813 (SB0861/CH0731)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862 /CH0510
Title
St. Mary’s County and Metropolitan Commission – Debt Limitations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0863
Title
St. Mary’s County – Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 /CH0650
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Officials - Salaries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0526 (SB0239) St. Mary’s County – Public and Nonpublic Schools – Prohibition on Possession of Tobacco Products by Minors By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0527 St. Mary’s County Human Relations Commission – Equal Treatment By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/06/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0528 /CH0589 St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 589
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0529 /CH0665 St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Distillery On-Site Consumption Permit By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 665
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0530 /CH0283 St. Mary's County - Gaming - Administration of Bingo Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0813 (SB0861/CH0731) St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0862 /CH0510 St. Mary’s County and Metropolitan Commission – Debt Limitations By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 510
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0863 St. Mary’s County – Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1097 /CH0650 St. Mary's County - Local Officials - Salaries By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 650
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/06/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page