Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Prince George's County Delegation & Montgomery Co Deleg

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 /CH0456
Title
Montgomery County Planning Board - Open Meetings - Video and Audio Streaming and Minutes PG/MC 101-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0397 /CH0611
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - County Council and District Council - Voting Thresholds PG/MC 100-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0399 /CH0612
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Minority Business Enterprise Utilization Program - Termination Extension PG/MC 105-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0400 /CH0457
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans and Their Spouses PG/MC 106-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505
Title
Montgomery County - Land Use Documents - Certification PG/MC 107-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0526 /CH0598
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Plumbing and Fuel Gas Services - Licenses and Penalties PG/MC 109-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535 /CH0740
Title
Washington Suburban Transit Commission - Montgomery County and Prince George's County Commissioners - Repeal of Term Limit PG/MC 111-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059 /CH0284
Title
Bicounty Commissions - Ethics - Certification of Compliance PG/MC 103-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0396 /CH0456 Montgomery County Planning Board - Open Meetings - Video and Audio Streaming and Minutes PG/MC 101-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0397 /CH0611 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - County Council and District Council - Voting Thresholds PG/MC 100-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0399 /CH0612 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Minority Business Enterprise Utilization Program - Termination Extension PG/MC 105-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 612
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2022 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0400 /CH0457 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans and Their Spouses PG/MC 106-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0505 Montgomery County - Land Use Documents - Certification PG/MC 107-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0526 /CH0598 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Plumbing and Fuel Gas Services - Licenses and Penalties PG/MC 109-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Economic Matters
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0535 /CH0740 Washington Suburban Transit Commission - Montgomery County and Prince George's County Commissioners - Repeal of Term Limit PG/MC 111-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1059 /CH0284 Bicounty Commissions - Ethics - Certification of Compliance PG/MC 103-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:24 PM
Click to return on the top page