Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Pensions, Joint Committee On

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 /CH0024 (SB0566/CH0025)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Climate Risk - Fiduciary Duties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0741
Title
Judges’ Retirement System – Purchase of Service Credit – Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 (SB0409/CH0355)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System – COVID–19–Related Death Benefits – Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0743 /CH0558 (SB0410/CH0559)
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744 /CH0353 (SB0502)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Administration - Clarifications and Corrections
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1091 (SB0739/CH0356)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division - Compensation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0409 /CH0355 (HB0742)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System – COVID–19–Related Death Benefits – Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0410 /CH0559 (HB0743/CH0558)
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0502 (HB0744/CH0353)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Administration - Clarifications and Corrections
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566 /CH0025 (HB0740/CH0024)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System – Investment Climate Risk – Fiduciary Duties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0739 /CH0356 (HB1091)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division - Compensation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 /CH0343 (HB1482)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Divestment From Russia
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0740 /CH0024 (SB0566/CH0025) State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Climate Risk - Fiduciary Duties By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24
Appropriations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0741 Judges’ Retirement System – Purchase of Service Credit – Repeal By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB0742 (SB0409/CH0355) State Retirement and Pension System – COVID–19–Related Death Benefits – Sunset Extension By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/17/2022 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0743 /CH0558 (SB0410/CH0559) Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 558
Appropriations
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0744 /CH0353 (SB0502) State Retirement and Pension System - Administration - Clarifications and Corrections By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Appropriations
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1091 (SB0739/CH0356) State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division - Compensation By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0409 /CH0355 (HB0742) State Retirement and Pension System – COVID–19–Related Death Benefits – Sunset Extension By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2022 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0410 /CH0559 (HB0743/CH0558) Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 559
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2022 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0502 (HB0744/CH0353) State Retirement and Pension System - Administration - Clarifications and Corrections By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2022 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0566 /CH0025 (HB0740/CH0024) State Retirement and Pension System – Investment Climate Risk – Fiduciary Duties By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2022 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
SB0739 /CH0356 (HB1091) State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division - Compensation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2022 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB1005 /CH0343 (HB1482) State Retirement and Pension System - Divestment From Russia By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2022 - 12:45 PM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:16 PM
Click to return on the top page