Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Howard County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1142 /CH0187
Title
Howard County – School Redistricting – Public Testimony Ho. Co. 07-21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1151 /CH0566
Title
Howard County - Class A Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Quota by Election District Ho. Co. 02-21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1152 /CH0661
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Off-Premises Consumption Ho. Co. 04-21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155 /CH0662
Title
Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Delivery Ho. Co. 01–21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1189
Title
Howard County Board of Education - School Safety Personnel Ho. Co. 10-21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1190 /CH0396
Title
Howard County – Board of Education – Redetermination of Geographic Attendance Area Ho. Co. 05-21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1191 /CH0563
Title
Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors Ho. Co. 03-21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1285
Title
Howard County - Fee for Rental Housing Services - Established Ho. Co. 15-21
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1142 /CH0187 Howard County – School Redistricting – Public Testimony Ho. Co. 07-21 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1151 /CH0566 Howard County - Class A Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Quota by Election District Ho. Co. 02-21 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1152 /CH0661 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Off-Premises Consumption Ho. Co. 04-21 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1155 /CH0662 Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Delivery Ho. Co. 01–21 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1189 Howard County Board of Education - School Safety Personnel Ho. Co. 10-21 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1190 /CH0396 Howard County – Board of Education – Redetermination of Geographic Attendance Area Ho. Co. 05-21 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 396
Ways and Means
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1191 /CH0563 Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors Ho. Co. 03-21 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 563
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1285 Howard County - Fee for Rental Housing Services - Established Ho. Co. 15-21 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:16 AM
Click to return on the top page