Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Frederick County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0560 /CH1007 (HB0588/CH1006)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Municipal Golf Course License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0561 /CH1005 (HB0587/CH1004)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Limited Beer, Wine, and Liquor Permit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0562 (HB0578)
Title
Sheriff of Frederick County - Salary - Workgroup
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0563 /CH1003 (HB0586/CH1002)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Weinberg Center/New Spires Arts Stages Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0767 /CH1020 (HB0743/CH1019)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Promoter's Permit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0769 /CH0966 (HB0740)
Title
Frederick County - Property Tax Credit for Property Located in Historic District - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0770 /CH1018 (HB0742/CH1017)
Title
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Stadium License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1002 (HB1377/CH1041)
Title
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Brewery and Distillery Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 /CH0993 (HB1479)
Title
Frederick County - Juveniles - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1151 (HB1015)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming - Acceptance of Credit as Payment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1152 (HB1016/CH0350)
Title
Frederick County - School Construction Master Plan Workgroup
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1153 (HB1017/CH0691)
Title
Boundary of the Frederick Soil Conservation District - Alteration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1154 (HB0960/CH0983)
Title
City of Frederick - Assignment of Offenders to Road Work - Repeal (Frederick City Road Gang Injustice Repeal Act)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0560 /CH1007 (HB0588/CH1006) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Municipal Golf Course License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1007
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0561 /CH1005 (HB0587/CH1004) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Limited Beer, Wine, and Liquor Permit By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1005
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0562 (HB0578) Sheriff of Frederick County - Salary - Workgroup By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0563 /CH1003 (HB0586/CH1002) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Weinberg Center/New Spires Arts Stages Beer, Wine, and Liquor License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1003
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0767 /CH1020 (HB0743/CH1019) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Promoter's Permit By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1020
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0769 /CH0966 (HB0740) Frederick County - Property Tax Credit for Property Located in Historic District - Alterations By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 966
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0770 /CH1018 (HB0742/CH1017) Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Stadium License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1018
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB1002 (HB1377/CH1041) Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Brewery and Distillery Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB1039 /CH0993 (HB1479) Frederick County - Juveniles - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 993
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB1151 (HB1015) Frederick County - Gaming - Acceptance of Credit as Payment By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1152 (HB1016/CH0350) Frederick County - School Construction Master Plan Workgroup By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1153 (HB1017/CH0691) Boundary of the Frederick Soil Conservation District - Alteration By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1154 (HB0960/CH0983) City of Frederick - Assignment of Offenders to Road Work - Repeal (Frederick City Road Gang Injustice Repeal Act) By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/23/2024 5:25 PM
Click to return on the top page