Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Education, Health, And Environmental Affairs Com, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067 (HB1313)
Title
Emergency Medical Services – Paramedics – Vaccination Administration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0125 /CH0122
Title
State Board of Chiropractic Examiners - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 /CH0099
Title
State Board of Public Accountancy – Education Requirements – Obsolete References
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0247 /CH0123
Title
State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0310
Title
Election Law – Campaign Finance Entities – Termination
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0341
Title
General Provisions - State Song - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0342 /CH0130
Title
Maryland Military Department – Sale of Superfluous Armories
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0343 /CH0119
Title
Natural Resources - Shrimp Fishery - Licensing and Regulation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 /CH0120
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - State Cost-Sharing Funds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0345
Title
State Government - Information Technology - Review of Projects and Proposals
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Public Notices and Hearings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347
Title
Environment - Public Hearing and Notification Modernization Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348
Title
State Government – Information Technology – Cybersecurity
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0349 /CH0131
Title
Environment – Drinking Water Revolving Loan Fund – Use of Funds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0350
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Leases
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0351
Title
State Government – Protection of Information – Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352 /CH0121
Title
Agriculture – Multiflora Rose Management – Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0353
Title
Veterans – Benefits and Benefits Appeals Services – Disclosure Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0067 (HB1313) Emergency Medical Services – Paramedics – Vaccination Administration By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0125 /CH0122 State Board of Chiropractic Examiners - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0141 /CH0099 State Board of Public Accountancy – Education Requirements – Obsolete References By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0247 /CH0123 State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0310 Election Law – Campaign Finance Entities – Termination By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0341 General Provisions - State Song - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0342 /CH0130 Maryland Military Department – Sale of Superfluous Armories By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2021 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0343 /CH0119 Natural Resources - Shrimp Fishery - Licensing and Regulation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0344 /CH0120 Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - State Cost-Sharing Funds By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0345 State Government - Information Technology - Review of Projects and Proposals By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0346 Department of Natural Resources - Public Notices and Hearings By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0347 Environment - Public Hearing and Notification Modernization Act By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0348 State Government – Information Technology – Cybersecurity By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0349 /CH0131 Environment – Drinking Water Revolving Loan Fund – Use of Funds By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0350 Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Leases By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0351 State Government – Protection of Information – Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act) By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0352 /CH0121 Agriculture – Multiflora Rose Management – Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0353 Veterans – Benefits and Benefits Appeals Services – Disclosure Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:26 PM
Click to return on the top page