Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Transportation, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0176 /CH0232
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rear-Facing Child Safety Seats - Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187
Title
Department of Transportation – Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0192 /CH0117
Title
State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Reauthorization Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208
Title
Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Service Provider - Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0210 /CH0118
Title
Tax Credits - Employer-Provided Commuter Benefits - Expansion and Administration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0218 /CH0119
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses and Identification Cards – Temporary Renewal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0176 /CH0232 Vehicle Laws - Rear-Facing Child Safety Seats - Requirement By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0187 Department of Transportation – Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0192 /CH0117 State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Reauthorization Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2022 - 2:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0208 Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Service Provider - Penalties By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0210 /CH0118 Tax Credits - Employer-Provided Commuter Benefits - Expansion and Administration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0218 /CH0119 Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses and Identification Cards – Temporary Renewal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:33 AM
Click to return on the top page