Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Transportation, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1340
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Governance, Funding, and Reporting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0032
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Limitation of Liability
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0170 /CH0303
Title
Transportation-Related Property - Prohibited Acts and Enforcement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0230
Title
Maryland Port Administration - Land Acquisition and Payment to Counties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0240 /CH0313
Title
Maryland Information Technology Development Project Fund – Sources of Revenue
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259
Title
Department of Transportation - Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds - Calculation of Debt Limit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0291 /CH0118
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses – Following Too Closely – Unified Truck Travel
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1340 Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Governance, Funding, and Reporting By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0032 Maryland Transit Administration - Limitation of Liability By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
SB0170 /CH0303 Transportation-Related Property - Prohibited Acts and Enforcement By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Finance
1/19/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0230 Maryland Port Administration - Land Acquisition and Payment to Counties By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0240 /CH0313 Maryland Information Technology Development Project Fund – Sources of Revenue By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0259 Department of Transportation - Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds - Calculation of Debt Limit By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0291 /CH0118 Motor Vehicle Offenses – Following Too Closely – Unified Truck Travel By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:28 PM
Click to return on the top page