Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Natural Resources, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0882 /CH0089
Title
Natural Resources – Pocomoke River Wildland – Alteration of Boundaries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178 /CH0087
Title
Program Open Space - Local Projects - Federal Funds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0190 /CH0088
Title
Tidal Fisheries Advisory Commission - Membership Term - Alteration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0882 /CH0089 Natural Resources – Pocomoke River Wildland – Alteration of Boundaries By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0178 /CH0087 Program Open Space - Local Projects - Federal Funds By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2022 - 2:30 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2022 - 3:00 PM
SB0190 /CH0088 Tidal Fisheries Advisory Commission - Membership Term - Alteration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2022 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:47 PM
Click to return on the top page