Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Department Of Labor

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 /CH0098
Title
Correctional Education – Changes to Mandatory Education Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 /CH0099
Title
State Board of Public Accountancy – Education Requirements – Obsolete References
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 /CH0249
Title
State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0219 /CH0100
Title
Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 /CH0101
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0281 /CH0102
Title
Office of the Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0086 /CH0098 Correctional Education – Changes to Mandatory Education Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Finance
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0141 /CH0099 State Board of Public Accountancy – Education Requirements – Obsolete References By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0206 /CH0249 State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Finance
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0219 /CH0100 Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0251 /CH0101 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Finance
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0281 /CH0102 Office of the Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Finance
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:30 PM
Click to return on the top page