Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Department Of Information Technology

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0209 /CH0166 (SB0239/CH0167)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Local Cybersecurity Preparedness and Response Plan and Assessment - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0221 (SB0242)
Title
Department of Information Technology - Maryland Digital Service - Establishment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235 /CH0164 (SB0244/CH0165)
Title
State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0807
Title
Information Technology - Modernizing Data Governance - Office of Enterprise Data and Council for Open Data Advancement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239 /CH0167 (HB0209/CH0166)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Local Cybersecurity Preparedness and Response Plan and Assessment - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0242 (HB0221)
Title
Department of Information Technology - Maryland Digital Service - Establishment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0244 /CH0165 (HB0235/CH0164)
Title
State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0209 /CH0166 (SB0239/CH0167) State Finance and Procurement - Local Cybersecurity Preparedness and Response Plan and Assessment - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2025 - 2:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0221 (SB0242) Department of Information Technology - Maryland Digital Service - Establishment By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2025 - 2:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0235 /CH0164 (SB0244/CH0165) State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2025 - 2:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0807 Information Technology - Modernizing Data Governance - Office of Enterprise Data and Council for Open Data Advancement By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0239 /CH0167 (HB0209/CH0166) State Finance and Procurement - Local Cybersecurity Preparedness and Response Plan and Assessment - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/16/2025 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0242 (HB0221) Department of Information Technology - Maryland Digital Service - Establishment By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/16 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/16/2025 - 2:00 PM
SB0244 /CH0165 (HB0235/CH0164) State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/16/2025 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/24/2025 10:38 AM
Click to return on the top page