Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Department Of Information Technology

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0235 /CH0317
Title
Major Information Technology Development Project Fund – Use of Funds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0345
Title
State Government - Information Technology - Review of Projects and Proposals
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348
Title
State Government – Information Technology – Cybersecurity
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0351
Title
State Government – Protection of Information – Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0235 /CH0317 Major Information Technology Development Project Fund – Use of Funds By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0345 State Government - Information Technology - Review of Projects and Proposals By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0348 State Government – Information Technology – Cybersecurity By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0351 State Government – Protection of Information – Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act) By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:28 PM
Click to return on the top page