Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Human Services, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1339 /CH0305
Title
Child Support - Guidelines
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0267 /CH0129
Title
Family Law – Investigation of Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect – Preliminary Report to State’s Attorney
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1339 /CH0305 Child Support - Guidelines By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Judiciary
3/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2021 - 1:45 PM
SB0267 /CH0129 Family Law – Investigation of Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect – Preliminary Report to State’s Attorney By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Judiciary
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 11/10/2021 4:28 PM
Click to return on the top page