Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Energy Administration, Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0894
Title
Transportation Electrification and Modernization (TEAM) Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1366
Title
Zero–Emission Energy Resources and Carbon Capture, Use, and Sequestration – Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Study
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215 /CH0246
Title
Energy Storage Systems - Income Tax Credit and Grant Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0894 Transportation Electrification and Modernization (TEAM) Act By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1366 Zero–Emission Energy Resources and Carbon Capture, Use, and Sequestration – Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Study By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0215 /CH0246 Energy Storage Systems - Income Tax Credit and Grant Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:32 AM
Click to return on the top page