Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Elections, State Board Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0738 /CH0117
Title
Election Law - Certificates of Candidacy and Ballot Questions - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0310 /CH0321
Title
Election Law – Campaign Finance Entities – Termination
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0738 /CH0117 Election Law - Certificates of Candidacy and Ballot Questions - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0310 /CH0321 Election Law – Campaign Finance Entities – Termination By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:28 PM
Click to return on the top page