Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Agriculture, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104 /CH0039 (SB0226/CH0040)
Title
Maryland Farms and Families Fund – Purpose and Use – Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0114 /CH0041 (SB0249/CH0042)
Title
Pesticide and Pest Control - Revisions to Pesticide Applicator's Law and Repeal of Obsolete Provisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0140 (SB0176)
Title
Agriculture - Soil Conservation and Water Quality Plan - Uses of Information
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0244 (SB0264)
Title
Plant Disease Control - Nurseries - Inspection, Certification, and Licensing Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0262 /CH0043 (SB0240/CH0044)
Title
Department of Agriculture - Maryland Agricultural Commission and Young Farmers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0176 (HB0140)
Title
Agriculture - Soil Conservation and Water Quality Plan - Uses of Information
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0226 /CH0040 (HB0104/CH0039)
Title
Maryland Farms and Families Fund - Purpose and Use - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0240 /CH0044 (HB0262/CH0043)
Title
Department of Agriculture – Maryland Agricultural Commission and Young Farmers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0249 /CH0042 (HB0114/CH0041)
Title
Pesticide and Pest Control - Revisions to Pesticide Applicator's Law and Repeal of Obsolete Provisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264 (HB0244)
Title
Plant Disease Control - Nurseries - Inspection, Certification, and Licensing Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0104 /CH0039 (SB0226/CH0040) Maryland Farms and Families Fund – Purpose and Use – Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0114 /CH0041 (SB0249/CH0042) Pesticide and Pest Control - Revisions to Pesticide Applicator's Law and Repeal of Obsolete Provisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0140 (SB0176) Agriculture - Soil Conservation and Water Quality Plan - Uses of Information By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
HB0244 (SB0264) Plant Disease Control - Nurseries - Inspection, Certification, and Licensing Fees By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
HB0262 /CH0043 (SB0240/CH0044) Department of Agriculture - Maryland Agricultural Commission and Young Farmers By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0176 (HB0140) Agriculture - Soil Conservation and Water Quality Plan - Uses of Information By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/28/2025 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0226 /CH0040 (HB0104/CH0039) Maryland Farms and Families Fund - Purpose and Use - Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Finance
1/30/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0240 /CH0044 (HB0262/CH0043) Department of Agriculture – Maryland Agricultural Commission and Young Farmers By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/28/2025 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0249 /CH0042 (HB0114/CH0041) Pesticide and Pest Control - Revisions to Pesticide Applicator's Law and Repeal of Obsolete Provisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/28/2025 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0264 (HB0244) Plant Disease Control - Nurseries - Inspection, Certification, and Licensing Fees By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/28/2025 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 3:44 PM
Click to return on the top page