Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Baltimore City Administration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1447
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Outdoor Table Service Privileges - Fee Prohibition and Alteration of Application Process
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0568 /CH0517 (HB0786)
Title
Health Records and Reporting of Overdoses - Limitations on Use in Criminal Investigation or Prosecution
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0729 /CH0593 (HB1362/CH0592)
Title
Baltimore City – Use of Highway User Revenues for Traffic Functions and Enforcement – Modification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0750 /CH0585 (HB1081/CH0584)
Title
Baltimore City – Vehicle Laws – Towing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851
Title
Labor and Employment - User Name and Password Privacy - Law Enforcement Agencies
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0864
Title
Public Safety - Police Officers - Emergency Termination
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0866
Title
Baltimore Police Department - Consent Decree - Exceptions to State Law
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1447 Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Outdoor Table Service Privileges - Fee Prohibition and Alteration of Application Process By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0568 /CH0517 (HB0786) Health Records and Reporting of Overdoses - Limitations on Use in Criminal Investigation or Prosecution By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 517
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0729 /CH0593 (HB1362/CH0592) Baltimore City – Use of Highway User Revenues for Traffic Functions and Enforcement – Modification By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 593
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0750 /CH0585 (HB1081/CH0584) Baltimore City – Vehicle Laws – Towing By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 585
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0851 Labor and Employment - User Name and Password Privacy - Law Enforcement Agencies By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Finance
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0864 Public Safety - Police Officers - Emergency Termination By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0866 Baltimore Police Department - Consent Decree - Exceptions to State Law By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:16 PM
Click to return on the top page