Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Budget And Taxation Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0174 /CH0221
Title
Mortality and Quality Review Committee - Duties, Reports, and Data - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0179 /CH0247
Title
Energy Performance Contracts – Duration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0181 /CH0131 (HB0204/CH0132)
Title
Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Application Filing Deadline – Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183 /CH0115
Title
State Government - Information Technology - Review of Projects and Proposals
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187
Title
Department of Transportation – Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0192 /CH0117
Title
State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Reauthorization Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0194
Title
Property Tax - Deadline Extension for Homeowners to Redeem Property Involved in a Tax Sale
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0197 /CH0129 (HB0203/CH0130)
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Retroactive Qualification and Calculation of the Credit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0201 /CH0133
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Property Appraisal Aids and Record Retention (Microfilm to Digital Act of 2022)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0210 /CH0118
Title
Tax Credits - Employer-Provided Commuter Benefits - Expansion and Administration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215 /CH0246
Title
Energy Storage Systems - Income Tax Credit and Grant Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1007 /CH0233
Title
University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0174 /CH0221 Mortality and Quality Review Committee - Duties, Reports, and Data - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2022 - 2:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0179 /CH0247 Energy Performance Contracts – Duration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0181 /CH0131 (HB0204/CH0132) Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Application Filing Deadline – Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0183 /CH0115 State Government - Information Technology - Review of Projects and Proposals By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0187 Department of Transportation – Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0192 /CH0117 State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Reauthorization Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2022 - 2:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0194 Property Tax - Deadline Extension for Homeowners to Redeem Property Involved in a Tax Sale By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0197 /CH0129 (HB0203/CH0130) Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Retroactive Qualification and Calculation of the Credit By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0201 /CH0133 State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Property Appraisal Aids and Record Retention (Microfilm to Digital Act of 2022) By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0210 /CH0118 Tax Credits - Employer-Provided Commuter Benefits - Expansion and Administration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0215 /CH0246 Energy Storage Systems - Income Tax Credit and Grant Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB1007 /CH0233 University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/08/2022 - 1:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:32 AM
Click to return on the top page